+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 114-176.
- Signed by President.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3378)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 497.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1067)
- Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4046.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1067)
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor