+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On July 22, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 1994 in the House:
- Joint Subcommittee Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Trade and by the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Joint Subcommittee Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Human Resources and by the Subcommittee on Trade.
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education and Civil Rights.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor Standards, Occupational Health and Safety.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education and Training.
On March 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor