+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 15, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 373.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-525 .
On June 7, 2012 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 15.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor