+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On October 14, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-488.
- Signed by President.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 6, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 4, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 4, 1988 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Yea-Nay Vote: 409 - 9 .
On September 30, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 15, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-513.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 943.
On September 8, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Agriculture Department, OMB.
On August 10, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 2285 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 26, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On May 25, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On May 24, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 23, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 381.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-629 .
On May 19, 1988 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-629 .
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On May 11, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 5, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 27, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 16, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 22, 1988 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On March 17, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On February 29, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On February 25, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor