+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 29, 2016 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 114-204. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On July 19, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5192-5193)
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3992)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4010.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3992-3993)
- Mr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor