+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 28, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 411 - 9 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On June 26, 2012 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. King objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4005 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. King moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352.
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-499 .
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Discharged.
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor