+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On June 23, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 381 - 41 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3993 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Matsui moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 15, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 290.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-507 .
On May 5, 2010 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 3, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
On November 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor