+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On April 26, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Acquisition.
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor