+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On January 14, 1983 in the Senate:
- Pocket Vetoed by President.
On January 3, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 21, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate amendment. By Voice Vote.
On December 20, 1982 in the House:
- House Concurred, in Senate Amendments, with Amendments by Yea-Nay Vote: 271 - 27 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On December 20, 1982 in the Senate:
- Unanimous Consent Request to Object to House Amendment to Senate Amendment Rejected in House.
On December 18, 1982 in the Senate:
- Senate further insisted on its amendments.
On December 9, 1982 in the Senate:
- House Disagreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On December 9, 1982 in the House:
- House Agreed to Request for Conference and Speaker Appointed Conferees: Rodino, Hughes, Kastenmeier, Conyers, Glickman, Sawyer, Fish, Kindness.
On December 2, 1982 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed conferees Thurmond; Mathias; Laxalt; Hatch; Dole; Biden; Kennedy; Leahy.
- Senate further insisted on its amendments and asked for a conference. By Voice Vote.
On October 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- House Disagreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On September 30, 1982 in the Senate:
- Senate insists on its amendments, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Thurmond; Mathias; Laxalt; Hatch; Dole; Biden; Kennedy; Leahy.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2572 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2572 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate.
On September 29, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 877.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond without amendment. Without written report.
On September 10, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Criminal Law. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On July 8, 1982 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice. Approved for full committee consideration without amendment favorably.
On November 3, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Juvenile Justice.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Law.
On October 27, 1981 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On October 26, 1981 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On October 21, 1981 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 181.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 97-283.
On September 15, 1981 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 30, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On July 30, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 16, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 22, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Crime.
On June 18, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor