+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3959 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Frank moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 311.
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 110-510 .
On October 31, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor