+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On October 6, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
- H.AMDT.1273 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.1273 Amendment Offered. An amendment of the Public Works and Transportation Committee in the nature of a substitute.
On September 24, 1986 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 37.
- Placed on House Calendar No: 213.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 99-882.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 23, 1986 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 31, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On December 16, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.1273
An amendment of the Public Works and Transportation Committee in the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor