+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 1986 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On March 18, 1986 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On February 27, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 16, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Recreation.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
On December 12, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor