+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On June 10, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On April 9, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 14, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On December 3, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
On November 25, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor