+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-55.
On November 3, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR H7450)
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR H7450)
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 4 (Roll no. 323). (text: CR 10/19/2021 H5654-5655)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5701-5702)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 4 (Roll no. 323).(text: CR 10/19/2021 H5654-5655)
On October 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-148.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 108.
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5654-5656)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3919.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Discharged.
On July 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor