+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Roth under authority of the order of the Senate of 06/30/2000 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-328 .
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 662.
On June 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 25, 2000 in the House:
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- Rule H. Res. 511 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 511 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3916 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The amendment recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3916 .
- H.AMDT.741 Amendment offered by the Committee on Ways and Means. An amendment made in order and considered as adopted pursuant to H. Res. 511 .
- H.AMDT.741 On agreeing to the Ways and Means amendment Agreed to pursuant to H. Res. 511 .
- Mr. Doggett moved to recommit with instructions to Ways and Means.
- Floor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Doggett motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion require the bill to be reported back to the House forthwith with an amendment which adds a new paragraph to stipulate that the provisions of the bill shall not apply to certain organizations that do not choose to make disclosures under existing law.
- The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 208 - 214 .
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 420 - 2 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 23, 2000 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 511 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3916 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. The amendment recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
On May 22, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 346.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 106-631 .
On May 17, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.741
An amendment made in order and considered as adopted pursuant to
+ − Vote
May 25, 2000: On Passage
- Yeas: 420
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor