+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-222.
On December 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On November 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On November 28, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3912 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor