+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 216 - 204 (Roll no. 643).
- H.Amdt.487 On agreeing to the Grijalva amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 237 (Roll no. 642). (consideration: CR H9535)
- UNFINISHED BUSINESS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, the House resumed with further consideration of H.R. 3905. (consideration: CR H9535-9536)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 631, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Grijalva amendment No. 1.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule 19, further consideration of H.R. 3905 is postponed.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- H.Amdt.487 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Grijalva. (consideration: CR H9510; text: CR H9510)
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 631. (consideration: CR H9498-9512; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H9498-9499)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3905.
- The rules provides 1 hour of general debate on both bills. For H.R. 3017, the bill is closed to amendments. For H.R. 3905, the rule provides for a specified amendment. The rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill.
- Rule H. Res. 631 passed House.
- DEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 3905.
On November 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 631 Reported to House. The rules provides 1 hour of general debate on both bills. For H.R. 3017, the bill is closed to amendments. For H.R. 3905, the rule provides for a specified amendment. The rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions on each bill.
On November 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-422.
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On October 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (3)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.486
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.487
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.