+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 6, 2000 in the House:
- Became Private Law No: 106-5.
- Signed by President.
On June 27, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 26, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On April 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On April 4, 2000 in the House:
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
- Considered from the Private Calendar.
- H.AMDT.646 On agreeing to the Sensenbrenner amendment Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.646 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Sensenbrenner. Amendment in the nature of a substitute
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 21, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 10.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-531 .
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.646
Amendment in the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor