+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-300.
- Signed by President.
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9600-9601)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 390.
- Mr. Smith (NJ) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H9600-9604)
On October 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4055 Amendment SA 4055 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6879; text: CR S6872-6873) In the nature of a substitute.
- S.Amdt.4055 Amendment SA 4055 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6876-6879)
- S.Amdt.4056 Amendment SA 4056 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Corker. (consideration: CR S6879; text: CR S6879) To amend the title.
- S.Amdt.4056 Amendment SA 4056 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4632-4638)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 390.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4632-4633)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E40)
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (5)
SA 4055
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
SA 4056
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.4055
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.4056
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.2044
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor