+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 9, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1300.
On June 8, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On May 19, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended , roll call #340 .
- Motion to recommit to the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with instructions rejected in House, roll call #339 .
- Motion to recommit to the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with instructions rejected in House, roll call #339 .
- Measure considered in House.
On May 18, 1978 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
On May 17, 1978 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On May 4, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1045 .
On April 7, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 95-1045 .
On January 4, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor