+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 5, 1998 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-217.
- Signed by President.
On July 28, 1998 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 24, 1998 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 23, 1998 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 435.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. Without written report.
On May 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On November 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held.
On April 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On April 23, 1997 in the House:
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 21, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 41.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-59 .
On April 16, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 13, 1997 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On January 7, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor