+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 27, 1990 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On October 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 906.
On October 1, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 27, 1990 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Mr. Kastenmeier moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 21, 1990 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 101-732.
On September 18, 1990 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 14, 1990 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 6, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 31, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice.
On January 25, 1990 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor