+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-368.
- Signed by President.
On July 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On July 6, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On June 29, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 29, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On June 27, 1988 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 100-734.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 447.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On June 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 766.
On June 22, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 16, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 28, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 16, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials.
On February 2, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor