+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On October 7, 1994 in the House:
- See H.R.5252 .
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor