+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6841-6842)
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1244. (consideration: CR H6819-6840)
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Lesko motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Lesko demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 164 (Roll no. 235). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H6819-6827)
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 174 - 218, 1 Present (Roll no. 234).
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lesko motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add language to the bill authorizing employers to test an employee or applicant for cannabis use.
- Mrs. Lesko moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H6839)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3884.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3884 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 116-67, modified by the amendment printed in the Rules Committee report, shall be considered as adopted.
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 1244 passed House.
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1244 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3884 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 116-67, modified by the amendment printed in the Rules Committee report, shall be considered as adopted.
On November 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497.
- Committee on Small Business discharged.
- Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged.
- Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-604, Part I.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Committee on Education and Labor discharged.
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On August 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On August 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Small Business, Natural Resources, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendments (2)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.903
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (120)
Type:
Primary Sponsor