+ − Summary
+ − Actions (22)
On July 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
On July 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and Safety.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Labor Standards.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On June 30, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Civil Service.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
On June 24, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Justice.
On June 18, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On June 12, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On June 11, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to House Committee on District of Columbia.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor