+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On April 29, 1986 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.4708 .
On December 13, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
On December 12, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fossil and Synthetic Fuels.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Transportation and Tourism.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance.
On December 9, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Government Information, Justice and Agriculture.
On December 6, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor