+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.5415 Amendment SP 5415 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Amendment SP 5415 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.5415 Proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Murkowski. To extend energy conservation programs under the Energy Policy and Conservation Act through calendar year 1997, and for other purposes.
- Amendment SP 5415 proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Murkowski.
- Measure laid before Senate.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 556.
On July 30, 1996 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Schaefer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 26, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 379.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 104-712 .
On July 24, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 23, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.5415
To extend energy conservation programs under the Energy Policy and Conservation Act through calendar year 1997, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor