+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 12, 2012 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 355 - 62 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 11, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Turner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3857 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-498 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 351.
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Transportation Security Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor