+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 299.
- Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-376, Part I.
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
On July 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (141)
Type:
Primary Sponsor