+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 11, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On August 6, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- H.AMDT.798 On agreeing to the Hall amendment Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.798 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Hall . Amendment in the nature of a substitute encourages the growth and development of commercial space activities in the United States through the purchasing power of the U.S. Government.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Hall asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Armed Services discharged.
On August 3, 1992 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Science, Space and Technology. H. Rept. 102-769, Part I.
On July 1, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On April 9, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 27, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Development.
On December 10, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Installations and Facilities.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On November 22, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
On November 21, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.798
Amendment in the nature of a substitute encourages the growth and development of commercial space activities in the United States through the purchasing power of the U.S. Government.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor