+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On May 14, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-33.
- Signed by President.
On May 3, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On May 2, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On May 2, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On May 1, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs, S. Rept. 93-133.
On March 28, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
On March 27, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On February 6, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Banking and Currency.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor