+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 624.
On September 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 6, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5073)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3839.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5073-5074)
- Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 553.
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-714, Part I.
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
On October 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor