+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On May 25, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 19, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 12, 1988 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 14, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From NRC.
On January 26, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
On January 21, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On January 4, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, NRC, OMB.
On December 22, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor