+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 20, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 104-189.
On August 9, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 5, 1996 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 2, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On July 30, 1996 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 25, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 23, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On July 17, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor