+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 20, 2006 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-197.
- Signed by President.
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
On December 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On October 18, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with fprty minutes of debate on H.R. 3830 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Porter moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 29, 2005 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 20, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor