+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 6, 2005 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-325 , Part I.
On October 19, 2005 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health Discharged.
On September 27, 2005 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 23, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
On September 20, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
On September 15, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor