+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 19, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-324.
On October 12, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 6, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 25, 2000 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3817 .
- Mr. Tancredo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On July 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 17, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 419.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-738 .
On June 7, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 16, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 3, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Department of Agriculture for comments.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor