+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 104-295.
- Signed by President.
On October 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- By Senator Roth from Committee on Finance filed written report. Report No. 104-393 .
On September 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- Amendment SP 5419 proposed by Senator Nickles for Senator Roth.
- S.AMDT.5419 Proposed by Senator Nickles for Senator Roth. To add a table of contents and make technical amendments.
- Amendment SP 5419 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.5419 Amendment SP 5419 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Mr. Crane asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 28, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633.
- Committee on Finance. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On July 30, 1996 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Crane moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
On July 29, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 383.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 104-718 .
On July 17, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 16, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.5419
To add a table of contents and make technical amendments.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor