+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On December 12, 1991 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 102-228.
- Signed by President.
On December 3, 1991 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 2, 1991 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 27, 1991 in the House:
- On motion that the House agree with amendments to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
On November 27, 1991 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 316 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Upon adoption of the resolution, it shall be in order to consider a non-divisible motion to take the bill from the Speaker's table, with Senate amendments thereto, and to concur in the Senate amendments with amendments printed in the report accompanying this resolution. The motion and the Senate amendments shall be considered read and debate on the motion shall not exceed one hour. All points of order against the motion shall be waived.
On November 27, 1991 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
On November 27, 1991 in the Senate:
- Mr. Fascell moved that the House agree with amendments to the Senate amendments.
On November 27, 1991 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to House amendments to Senate amendments by Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
- Rule H. Res. 316 passed House.
On November 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Amendment SP 1440 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 1439 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 86-8.
- S.AMDT.1440 Amendment SP 1440 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 1439 proposed by Senator Nunn.
- S.AMDT.1440 Proposed by Senator Byrd to Amendment SP 1439. To include that it is the sense of the Senate that the conferees on H.J.Res.157 , the Dire Emergency Supplemental Appropriations Act for FY 1992, should consider providing the necessary authority for the Secretary of Defense to obligate these funds in that Conference Agreement.
- Amendment SP 1440 proposed by Senator Byrd to Amendment SP 1439.
- S.AMDT.1439 Proposed by Senator Nunn. To provide for the use of Department of Defense resources for destroying Soviet nuclear and other weapons.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Amendment SP 1441 proposed by Senator Boren.
- S.AMDT.1439 Amendment SP 1439 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 86-8.
- S.AMDT.1441 Amendment SP 1441 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 87-7.
- S.AMDT.1441 Proposed by Senator Boren. Relative to the authority to transfer certain funds to provide emergency airlift and other support.
- S.AMDT.1444 Proposed by Senator Cranston. To eliminate a critical threat to nuclear nonproliferation efforts by safeguarding dangerous weapons usable materials from United States and Soviet warheads.
- Amendment SP 1443 proposed by Senator Levin.
- S.AMDT.1444 Proposed amendment SP 1444 withdrawn in Senate.
- Proposed amendment SP 1444 withdrawn in Senate.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 1444 proposed by Senator Cranston.
- S.AMDT.1443 Amendment SP 1443 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 87-7.
- Amendment SP 1443 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 87-7.
- Amendment SP 1441 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 87-7.
- S.AMDT.1443 Proposed by Senator Levin. To express the sense of the Senate that the President should promptly consult with Congress for the purpose of preparing a comprehensive plan entitled "International Investment for Democracy" that would assist the Soviet republics to avoid social chaos and achieve economic and political stability.
On November 21, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342.
On November 19, 1991 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Fascell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Amendments (5)
S.AMDT.1439
To provide for the use of Department of Defense resources for destroying Soviet nuclear and other weapons.
S.AMDT.1440
To include that it is the sense of the Senate that the conferees on
S.AMDT.1441
Relative to the authority to transfer certain funds to provide emergency airlift and other support.
S.AMDT.1443
To express the sense of the Senate that the President should promptly consult with Congress for the purpose of preparing a comprehensive plan entitled "International Investment for Democracy" that would assist the Soviet republics to avoid social chaos and achieve economic and political stability.
S.AMDT.1444
To eliminate a critical threat to nuclear nonproliferation efforts by safeguarding dangerous weapons usable materials from United States and Soviet warheads.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor