+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3807.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- House amendment offered
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1033. (consideration: CR H4401-4414)
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3807 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed. Bill is closed to amendments.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- Ms. Van Duyne moved to recommit to the Committee on Small Business. (text: CR H4412-4414)
- The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
- On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 205 - 219 (Roll no. 122).
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 203 (Roll no. 123).(text: CR H4401-4404)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 203 (Roll no. 123). (text: CR H4401-4404)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Received in the Senate.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 1033 passed House.
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1033 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3807 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed. Bill is closed to amendments.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E628)
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.191
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (232)
Type:
Primary Sponsor