+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 31, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-640 , Part I.
- Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 461.
- Mr. Franks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3803 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: : 220 - 154, 2 Present .
On July 18, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on the Constitution Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 14.
On July 16, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor