+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 561.
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-677, Part I.
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
On July 25, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor