+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On August 2, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 1, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 26, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 3, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From NTSB.
On September 20, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, OMB, NTSB.
On August 18, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Aviation.
On August 4, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor