+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 112-220.
- Signed by President.
On December 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 386 - 6 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on agreeing to the Senate amendment to H.R. 3783 .
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3334 Amendment SA 3334 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3334 Amendment SA 3334 proposed by Senator Coons for Senator Rubio. To provide that the comprehensive strategy may be submitted in classified form, but shall include an unclassified summary of policy recommendations to address the growing Iranian threat in the Western Hemisphere.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On September 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 19, 2012 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3783 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia .
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3334
To provide that the comprehensive strategy may be submitted in classified form, but shall include an unclassified summary of policy recommendations to address the growing Iranian threat in the Western Hemisphere.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor