+ − Summary
+ − Actions (18)
On May 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor