+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- See also H.R. 5835 .
On July 17, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On July 16, 1990 in the House:
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 101-606.
- Mr. Oberstar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Mr. Clinger demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 373.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 28, 1990 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On June 27, 1990 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 1, 1990 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 6, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, OMB.
On December 4, 1989 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Aviation Prior to Introduction .
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On November 20, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor