+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 1, 1994 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-288.
- Signed by President.
On July 21, 1994 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 19, 1994 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On June 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Baucus without amendment. Without written report.
On June 23, 1994 in the House:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On April 13, 1994 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 417 - 1 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Mr. Traficant moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until April 13.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 147.
- Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 103-457.
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor