+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 23, 1991 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 298 passed House.
On November 21, 1991 in the House:
- H.AMDT.417 On agreeing to the Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- Rule H. Res. 289 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 289 .
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 289 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Bob Carr to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.417 Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs. An amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs printed in the bill as an original bill for the purpose of amendment.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 3768 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- Mr. Armey moved to recommit with instructions to Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with ten minutes of debate on the Armey motion to recommit the bill to the Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs with instruction to report the bill back with an amendment to restrict Federal Deposit Insurance coverage to one $100,000 banking account and one $100,000 IRA account per depositor.
- The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 74 - 355 .
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 344 - 84 .
On November 20, 1991 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 289 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3768 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. All points of order against consideration of the bill shall be waived. It shall be in order to consider the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs now printed in the bill as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule. All points of order against the substitute shall be waived. No amendment to the substitute shall be in order. The motion to recommit may contain instructions only if offered by Representative Michel of Illinois, or his designee.
On November 19, 1991 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 194.
- Reported by the Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs. H. Rept. 102-330.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On November 14, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.417
An amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs printed in the bill as an original bill for the purpose of amendment.
+ − Vote
November 21, 1991: On Passage
- Yeas: 344
- Nays: 84
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor