+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 24, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 445.
- House Committee on Public Works and Transportation Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 6, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On May 23, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Jun 24, 88.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 100-645 .
On December 16, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment Discharged.
On December 15, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor